Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021971

EP1021971 - Filament tuft absorbent by capillary action [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH
Mühlenweg 17-37
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Lindner, Ralf
Freiheitsstrasse 67
42277 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Iglseder, Heinrich
Im Fasenenkamp 10
31552 Rodenberg / DE
03 / Graute, Ludger
Witteringstrasse 24
45130 Essen / DE
04 / Dieudonné, Stephen Peter
Dietrich-Bonhoeffer-Strasse 3
58300 Wetter/Ruhr / DE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Müller, Enno , et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99124358.507.12.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateDE199815940322.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19859403
DE199914745902.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19947459
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021971
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021971
Date:08.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/41]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1021971
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A46B3/10
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:Durch Kapillarwirkung saugfähiges Bündel von Borstenfilamenten[2000/30]
English:Filament tuft absorbent by capillary action[2000/30]
French:Touffe de filaments absorbant par capillarité[2000/30]
Examination procedure10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
19.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
15.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
IT08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
LU07.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
CH31.12.2003
LI31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GB08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/12]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
LU07.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
CH31.12.2003
LI31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GB08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2005/23]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
LU07.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GB08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2005/02]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GB08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2005/01]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GB08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2005/01]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GB08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2004/46]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
ES19.01.2004
Former [2004/41]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/40]FI08.10.2003
IE08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/36]FI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY07.12.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI08.10.2003
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE08.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0300637  (VAX APPLIANCES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US5702194  (HSU SHIH HSIUNG [TW]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0097322  (KELEMEN LASZLO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *