Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008284

EP1008284 - Telescoping implement connection for motorized vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.09.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bernhardt, Gerd, Prof. Dr. Ing. habil.
Pulverweg 3c
01728 Hänichen / DE
02 / Fedotow, Sergej
Hochschulstrasse 46, Zimmer 15 05
01069 Dresden / DE
03 / Wünsche, Mario
Kleinröhrsdorfer Strasse 4
01454 Radeberg / DE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2000/24]Lau-Loskill, Philipp, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date99124372.607.12.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateDE199815716711.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19857167
[2000/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1008284
Date:14.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1008284
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01B59/06
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/39]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Teleskopierbarer Geräteanbau eines Kraftfahrzeugs[2000/24]
English:Telescoping implement connection for motorized vehicle[2000/24]
French:Accouplement télescopique d'outil pour véhicule motorisé[2000/24]
Examination procedure10.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
26.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/42]
27.05.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3937339  (GEIS WARREN P, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]FR2694316  (PEL JOB GROUPE [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 22 - line 28; figure - *;
 [Y]FR1075415  (HANNOVERSCHE MASCHB AG VORMALS) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]GB797804  (W E BRAY & COMPANY LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 22 - line 33; figure - *;
 [A]FR93073E  (BOBARD EMILE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2289036  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE3333865