Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018603

EP1018603 - Drive shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Link, Manfred
Brettacher Weg 24
71334 Waiblingen / DE
[2000/28]
Application number, filing date99124533.309.12.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateDE199910044908.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19900449
[2000/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018603
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1018603
Date:11.07.2001
[2001/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018603
Date:15.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16C3/02, F16D3/74
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/14]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Antriebswelle[2000/28]
English:Drive shaft[2000/28]
French:Arbre de transmission[2000/28]
Examination procedure27.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/38]
11.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2004Fee for grant paid
10.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1443599  (HACKFORTH B, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5476421  (MOORE RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 44 - line 48 *;
 [A]JPH10331863  ;
 [A]US5624990  (VIPPERMAN HOWARD [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [DA]DE8221412U  (M.A.N.) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [DA]US2271567  (OLSON GORDON L) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US2994213  (ARNOLD DONOVAN E, et al) [DA] 1 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10331863 A 19981215 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS2271567
 US2994213
 DE8221412U