Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016497

EP1016497 - Machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DECKEL MAHO Pfronten GmbH
Tiroler Strasse 85
D-87459 Pfronten / DE
[2004/28]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
DECKEL MAHO GmbH
Tiroler Strasse 85
D-87459 Pfronten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hoppe, Gerd
Rohrbergstrasse 5
34317 Habichtswald / DE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99124804.813.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateDE199816049228.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19860492
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016497
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016497
Date:02.05.2002
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016497
Date:21.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23Q3/157
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/04]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Werkzeugmaschine[2000/27]
English:Machine tool[2000/27]
French:Machine-outil[2000/27]
Examination procedure18.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
28.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2004Fee for grant paid
17.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0516597  (MIKRON SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0839382  (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) [A] 1-7 * figure 5 *