Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010445

EP1010445 - Video game device, play control method for video game, and readable recording medium recording the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Konami Computer Entertainment Osaka
15-10, Nishitenma 4-chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Konami Computer Entertainment Osaka
15-10, Nishitenma 4-chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toyohara, Koji
1-3 Miyagawacho 5-chome, Nagata-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Tanibuchi, Hiroshi
18-10-205 Mukonosohonmachi 3-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Maeda, Koji
2-9-305 Ichinochohigashi 1-chou
Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
04 / Narita, Fujitomo
23-5 Mukonoso 5-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99124805.513.12.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateJP1998037508811.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37508898
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010445
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010445
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/10]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Videospielvorrichtung, Spielkontrollverfahren für Videospiel und entsprechendes Aufzeichnungsmedium[2002/50]
English:Video game device, play control method for video game, and readable recording medium recording the method[2000/25]
French:Appareil de jeu vidéo, méthode de contrôle de jeu pour jeu vidéo et support d'enregistrement correspondant[2000/25]
Former [2000/25]Videospielvorrichtung, Spielkontrollverfahren für Videospiel und entsprechendes Aufzeichungsmedium
Examination procedure02.11.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2003Fee for grant paid
14.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0844010  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * column 9, line 7 - line 16 * * column 11, line 25 - line 27 * * column 13, line 46 - column 14, line 9 *;
 [A]US5462275  (LOWE DANNY D [CA], et al) [A] 1,5,8,14-16 * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 6 * * column 16, line 12 - line 35 *;
 [A]US4711543  (BLAIR PRESTON E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,13-16 * column 3, line 9 - line 27 * * column 12, line 8 - line 45 *;
 [A]  P. ANDERSON, "NHL 99 (PSX) Review", [ONLINE], (19981026), pages 1 - 5, URL: www.sports-gaming.com/hockey/nhl99/review_psx.shtml, (20000420), XP002136298 [A] 1,5,13-16 * page 2, paragraph 7 - page 3, paragraph 1 *