Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022494

EP1022494 - Fault detection system and method for solenoid controlled actuators of a transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Alexander, Randy P.
23608 Ironwood Drive
Elkhart, Indiana 46516 / US
02 / Wadas, David L.
6300 Willowbrook Drive
Kalamazoo, MI 49004-9000 / US
03 / Wang, Yei Dei
1240 Lakeway Avenue
Kalamazoo, MI 49001-4938 / US
[2000/35]
Former [2000/30]01 / Alexander, Randy P.
3012 East Halbert Road
Battle Creek, MI 49017-8079 / US
02 / Wadas, David L.
6300 Willowbrook Drive
Kalamazoo, MI 49004-9000 / US
03 / Wang, Yei Dei
1240 Lakeway Avenue
Kalamazoo, MI 49001-4938 / US
Representative(s)Rüger Abel
Patentanwälte
Webergasse 3
73728 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Webergasse 3
73728 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date99124894.917.12.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateUS1998021902923.12.1998         Original published format: US 219029
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022494
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022494
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022494
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/12, G01R31/327, G01R31/06
[2004/05]
Former International [2000/30]F16H61/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/43]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Feststellung von Fehlfunktionen für magnetgesteuerte Stellantriebe eines Getriebes[2000/30]
English:Fault detection system and method for solenoid controlled actuators of a transmission system[2000/30]
French:Procédé et dispositif de détection de pannes pour les actionneurs contrôlés par solénoides d'un transmission[2000/30]
Examination procedure22.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/39]
29.07.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.12.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
31.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2005Fee for grant paid
13.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.10.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.10.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4932246  (DEUTSCH ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 56 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 5 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 9 * * column 10, line 39 - column 11, line 2 * * column 11, line 42 - line 50 *;
 [A]WO9824106  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 9 * * page 4, line 30 - page 7, line 25; figure 1 *