blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1022456

EP1022456 - Coating for a liquid-propellant rocket combustion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2012Revocation of patentpublished on 18.04.2012  [2012/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obschestvo " Nauchno-Proizvodstvennoe Obiedinenie" "Energomash" Imeni Akademia V.P.Glushko"
ulitsa Burdenko, d.l. Moskovskaya oblast
Khimki / RU
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]For all designated states
Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obschestvo " Nauchno-Proizvodstvennoe Obiedinenie" "Energomash" Imeni Akademia V.P.Glushko"
ulitsa Burdenko, d.l.
Moskovskaya oblast, Khimki / RU
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obschestvo Nauchno-Proizvodstvennoe Obiedinenie "Energomash", Imeni Akademika V.P. Glushko of Russian Fe
deration, ulitsa Burdenko, d.1
Moskovskaya oblast, Khimki / RU
Inventor(s)01 / Vasin, Alexandr, Alexandrovich
ulitsa Zemlyanoi val, d.61/2, kv.2
Moscow, Russian Federation / RU
02 / Fedorov, Vladimir, Vladimirovich
prospekt Mira, d.99, kv.30
Moscow, Russian Federation / RU
03 / Babaeva, Galina, Andreevna
ulitsa Svobody, d.63, kv.320
Moscow, Russian Federation / RU
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date99124967.315.12.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateRU1999010083021.01.1999         Original published format: RU 99100830
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022456
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022456
Date:10.10.2001
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022456
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:F02K9/64, F02K9/97
[2000/30]
CPC:
F02K9/974 (EP,US); F02K9/64 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/27]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beschichtung für eine Brennkammer einer Flüssigtreibstoffrakete[2000/30]
English:Coating for a liquid-propellant rocket combustion chamber[2000/30]
French:Revêtement pour une chambre de combustion d'une fusée à propergol liquide[2000/30]
Examination procedure26.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
11.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2005Fee for grant paid
14.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.2005  05.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Astrium GmbH
Robert-Koch-Str. 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hummel, Adam, et al, et al
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Patentabteilung
81663 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/51]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2005  05.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Astrium GmbH
Robert-Koch-Str. 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hummel, Adam, et al, et al
EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung
81663 München / DE
Former [2006/08]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2005  05.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
EADS Space Transportation GmbH
Hünefeldstrasse 1-5
28199 Bremen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hummel, Adam, et al, et al
EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung
81663 München / DE
Former [2006/07]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2005   
EADS Deutschland GmbH
Patentabteilung LG-SP
81663 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.02.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.08.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.05.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.06.2009Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.12.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
20.12.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/16]
20.12.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.08.2009Appeal received No.  T1744/09
26.10.2009Statement of grounds filed
20.12.2011Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
20.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
07.02.2012Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3439502  (LEE SEN L) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US3005338  (LIBBY PAUL A, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 58 - line 61; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5103637  (ITOH TAKAHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US4707225  (SCHULER FREDERICK T [US], et al)
by applicantUS3648461
    - V.P. GLUSHKO, Encyclopedia "Cosmonautics", CHIEF ED., (1985), page 153
    - G.G. GAKHUN ET AL., Liquid-fuel Rocket Engine Design and Engineering, (1989), pages 101-111 - FIG 6.1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.