Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013159

EP1013159 - Agricultural working machine control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Saulgau GmbH
Postfach 11 54
88340 Bad Saulgau / DE
[2010/37]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH
Postfach 1154
D-88340 Saulgau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Berkemann, Stephan
Auf der Töterlöh 8
33100 Paderborn / DE
02 / Betz, Peter
Kleines Eschle 24
88471 Baustetten / DE
03 / Kleine, Herbert
Heinrichstrasse 6
46284 Dorsten / DE
04 / Frick, Clemens
Laubbach 37
88356 Ostrach / DE
[2000/26]
Application number, filing date99124990.515.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateDE199815987523.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19859875
[2000/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1013159
Date:28.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1013159
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1013159
Date:15.09.2010
Language:DE
[2010/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A01B73/04
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:Steuerung für landwirtschaftliche Arbeitsmaschine[2000/26]
English:Agricultural working machine control[2000/26]
French:Contrôle pour machine de travail agricole[2010/23]
Former [2000/26]Controle pour machine de travail agricole
Examination procedure25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
20.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2010Fee for grant paid
30.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06010235.7  / EP1736043
Opposition(s)16.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
AT15.12.2010
GB15.12.2010
LU15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
[2012/44]
Former [2012/11]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
AT15.12.2010
GB15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Former [2012/01]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GB15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/47]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
FR03.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/45]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
BE31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/36]CY15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/35]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/30]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/27]CY15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
GR16.12.2010
PT17.01.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0494516  (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,12,13 * column 6, line 12 - column 14, line 34; figures 1-6; claims 1,8-13 *;
 [A]GB2149734  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [A] 1 * page 1, line 114 - page 4, line 100; figures 1-9; claims 14,18,19,22,23 *;
 [AD]EP0788730  (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3900724  (DIEGEL) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19603400