Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011003

EP1011003 - Light-scanning optical system and image-forming apparatus comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2007
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/33]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishibe, Yoshihiro, c/o Canon K. K.
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Weser, Wolfgang , et al
Weser & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]Weser, Wolfgang , et al
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Former [2000/25]Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125045.715.12.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateJP1998037573417.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37573498
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1011003
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1011003
Date:13.08.2003
[2003/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1011003
Date:16.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:G02B26/12
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/19]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches System zum Lichtabtasten und dessen Verwendung in einer Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung[2000/25]
English:Light-scanning optical system and image-forming apparatus comprising the same[2000/25]
French:Système optique de balayage à lumière et dispositif de formation d'images de la même utilisation[2000/25]
Examination procedure11.08.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
08.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
16.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2006Fee for grant paid
03.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5841566  (MINAKUCHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9 * column 2, line 30 - line 53; figure 4 * * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 18 *;
 [X]US5748356  (PARK CHANG JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 15; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]EP0269450  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,10 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 9; figures 1,4,6,8 * * column 6, line 14 - line 54 * * column 4, line 42 - line 62 *;
 [XA]US4878066  (SHIRAISHI TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * column 1, line 5 - line 52; figures 1,8,9,16,25 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 18 * [A] 3;
 [X]US4978975  (SAITO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US4788560  (MIURA KUNIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-3,7 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 6 *;
 [X]US5200611  (HATTORI YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 2; figures 2,7-9 *