Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035056

EP1035056 - Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/51]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Madrzak, Zygmunt
Ellwanger Strasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
02 / Wohlfahrt, Matthias
Teutonenweg 55
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date99125198.417.12.1999
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199911056910.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910569
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035056
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035056
Date:09.01.2002
[2002/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035056
Date:14.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/26
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   SE [2002/39]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Wickelmaschine zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn[2000/37]
English:Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method[2000/37]
French:Méthode pour bobiner une bande de matériau et bobineuse pour réaliser cette méthode[2000/37]
Examination procedure09.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
10.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2003Fee for grant paid
15.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3515519  (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,14,16,17,27 * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 28; figure - * [A] 2,5-13,15,18-26;
 [E]US6029927  (WOHLFAHRT MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [E] 1-3,6,14-16,19,27 * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 37; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE19710282  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *