Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013462

EP1013462 - Method for making a colored relief strip by etching [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VENETA DECALCOGOMME S.R.L
Via Albettoniera, 44
35030 Bastia di Rovolon (PADOVA) / IT
[2000/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Ferro, Mario
Via A. Grillo, 9
35030 San Biagio di Teolo (PADOVA) / IT
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing. , et al
Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2000/26]Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99125200.817.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0281823.12.1998         Original published format: IT MI982818
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1013462
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1013462
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1013462
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B41M1/28, B41M3/00
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/04]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gefärbten Relief-Streifens durch Ätzen[2000/26]
English:Method for making a colored relief strip by etching[2000/26]
French:Méthode pour la fabrication d'une bande colorée en relief par gravure[2000/26]
Examination procedure05.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
17.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2004Fee for grant paid
18.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4893952  (SVYATSKY EDUARD [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 6 - line 17 * * column 3, line 42 - line 48 * * column 5, line 32 - line 35 *;
 [A]JPS63144074  (SHOKOSHA KK) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19750259  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 15 - line 24 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 5; figure 2; claims 1,7 *;
 [A]EP0070643  (METAL BOX PLC [GB]) [A] 1-8 * page 20, line 7 - line 27; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3618444  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 16 - line 39; claim 1 *