Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1014013

EP1014013 - Vapor compression type refrigeration cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi
Gunma 372 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
SANDEN CORPORATION
20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi Gunma 372 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Komatsu, Shunji, c/o Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372 / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Kiyokazu, c/o Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372 / JP
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125221.417.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateJP1998036063818.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36063898
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1014013
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25B1/00, F25B41/06
[2000/26]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/11]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kältekreislauf mit Dampfverdichtung[2000/26]
English:Vapor compression type refrigeration cycle[2000/26]
French:Cycle frigorifique à compression de vapeur[2000/26]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
17.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
29.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/45]
01.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/45]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.02.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19631914  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 8, line 55; figures 1-8 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]FR2539855  (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 35 - page 7, line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3478534  (MATTHIES ALAN A) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 5, line 70 - column 8, line 56; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2943643  (GEORGE PINTER, et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 26; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE3442169  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 7, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph L; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]JPH10141822  ;
 [A]US4461635  (RUDEBECK VIGGO [DK]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 39; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2922292  (LANGE HAROLD T)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [A] 1,2 * abstract *