Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036842

EP1036842 - Use of cyanobacterial fructose-1,6-bisphosphatase to improve growth of plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nara Institute of Science and Technology
8916-5, Takayama-cho Ikoma City
Nara Pref. / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Nara Institute of Science and Technology
8916-5, Takayama-cho
Ikoma City, Nara Pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokota, Akiho
11-37-108, Nishimatsugaoka
Ikoma-shi, Nara-pref. / JP
02 / Shigeoka, Shigeru
1264-31, Kanaoka-cho
Sakai-city, Osaka-fu / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125331.120.12.1999
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999006289110.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6289199
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1036842
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1036842
Date:28.08.2002
[2002/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036842
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/16, C12N15/85, A01H5/00, C12N15/82
[2002/33]
Former International [2000/38]C12N9/16, C12N15/85, A01H5/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2003/21]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Fructose-1,6-Bisphosphatase aus Cyanobakterien zur Verbesserung des Pflanzenwachstums[2000/38]
English:Use of cyanobacterial fructose-1,6-bisphosphatase to improve growth of plants[2000/38]
French:Utilisation de fructose-1,6-bisphosphatase cyanobacterienne pour améliorer la croissance des plantes[2000/38]
Examination procedure20.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/38]
09.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2004Fee for grant paid
03.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9858069  (MONSANTO CO [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5693507  (DANIELL HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19502053  (INST GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [DY]  TAMOI MASAHIRO ET AL, "Molecular characterization and resistance to hydrogen peroxide to two fructose-1,6-bisphosphatases from Synechococcus PCC 7942.", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (1996), vol. 334, no. 1, ISSN 0003-9861, pages 27 - 36, XP002203307 [DY] 1-11 * abstract * * page 35, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.1996.0425
 [A]  RAINES CHRISTINE A ET AL, "New insights into the structure and function of sedoheptulose-1,7-bisphosphatase;an important but neglected Calvin cycle enzyme", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (199901), vol. 50, no. 330, ISSN 0022-0957, pages 1 - 8, XP002148063 [A] 1 * page 6, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jexbot/50.330.1
 [A]  HARRISON E P ET AL, "REDUCED SEDOHEPTULOSE-1,7-BISPHOSPHATASE LEVELS IN TRANSGENIC TOBACCO LEAD TO DECREASED PHOTOSYNTHETIC CAPACITY AND ALTERED CARBOHYDRATE ACCUMULATION", PLANTA, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (1998), vol. 204, no. 1, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 27 - 36, XP000946358 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004250050226