Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016691

EP1016691 - Curing of butyl rubber with a phenolic resin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, ON N7T 7M2 / CA
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Hopkins, William
1604 Holden Drive
Sarnia, Ontario, Canada N7S 6G2 / CA
02 / von Hellens, Carl Walter
1953 Winslow Crescent
Bright's Grove, Ontario, Canada NON 1CO / CA
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Feldhues, Michael L.F.
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
Konzernbereich RP - Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Feldhues, Michael L.F., Dr.
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99125338.620.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateCA1998225770731.12.1998         Original published format: CA 2257707
CA1999225847213.01.1999         Original published format: CA 2258472
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016691
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/22
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT [2001/12]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Aushärtung von Butylkautschuk mit einem Phenolharz[2000/27]
English:Curing of butyl rubber with a phenolic resin[2000/27]
French:Procédé pour durcir du caoutchouc butyle avec une résine phénolique[2000/27]
Examination procedure05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
29.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2248625  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 26 - line 30 * * example 1; table 1 *;
 [Y]EP0850991  (ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, line 45 - page 5, line 48 * * page 6, line 8 - line 16 * * page 6, line 39 - line 47 * * page 12, line 18 - line 26 * * examples 1-16,J; tables I-VI * * claims 3,7,14 *