blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992523 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992523



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 254
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
13.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.08.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
26.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
19.04.2006 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
19.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.01.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.11.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2005 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
26.10.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
25.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.10.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.10.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.08.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.08.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
17.06.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.02.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.02.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.01.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.12.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
30.12.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
30.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
30.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.12.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
29.04.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.04.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 7
22.04.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.01.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
27.11.2003 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
19.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
06.08.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.08.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
06.08.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
16.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
16.05.2003 Description Search / examination 2
16.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.01.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.01.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
12.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.09.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.09.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.09.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.08.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
18.04.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.03.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.03.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.03.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
17.02.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Description Search / examination 27
21.12.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
21.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 29
21.12.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7