blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992523


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
04.08.2006 Revocation of patent published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
13.04.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.04.2006 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
08.11.2005 Change: Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
20.08.2005 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.06.2005 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
15.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
18.03.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.05.2005  [2005/18]
03.02.2005 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
31.12.2004 Opposition filed published on  16.02.2005  [2005/07]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
19.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.01.2005  [2005/01]
29.10.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
03.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
30.04.2004 Change - applicant published on  16.06.2004  [2004/25]
13.02.2004 (Expected) grant published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
11.02.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.02.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.08.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2003 Change - German title published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
22.05.2003 Examination report or reply
14.01.2003 Examination report or reply
15.11.2002 Examination report or reply
11.09.2002 Examination report or reply
31.07.2002 Renewal fee
03.05.2002 First examination report
29.04.2002 Examination report or reply
02.08.2001 Renewal fee
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
04.08.2000 Change - applicant published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
11.07.2000 Renewal fee
14.04.2000 Change - inventor published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
19.01.2000 Change - extension states
11.01.2000 Renewal fee