blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0992523 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP97113124 EP99125514



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0992523Global Dossier 31.03.2004B1
EP0992523 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP97113124 30.07.1997
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1126771C 05.11.2003C
CN1208739 24.02.1999A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
CN97116370 18.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5856369 05.01.1999A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
US90201797 29.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5877268 02.03.1999A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
US90201797 29.07.1997
US17032898 13.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH10168178Global Dossier 23.06.1998A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3971716BGlobal Dossier 05.09.2007B2
JP2003335862 28.11.2003A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0822218Global Dossier 25.10.2000B1
EP0822218 15.07.1998A3
EP0822218 04.02.1998A2
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT197164T 15.11.2000T
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT263202T 15.04.2004T
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU709737B 02.09.1999B2
AU3237397 05.02.1998A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9704415 22.12.1998A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2211775 26.11.2002C
CA2211775 30.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100390215C 28.05.2008C
CN1566173 19.01.2005A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69703374D 30.11.2000D1
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69703374T 22.02.2001T2
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69728440D 06.05.2004D1
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69728440T 13.01.2005T2
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID17842 29.01.1998A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100593948B 20.09.2006B1
KR980009327 30.04.1998A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX9705754 30.08.1998A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO973506L 02.02.1998L
NO973506D 30.07.1997D0
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NZ328459 19.12.1997A
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG66384 16.04.2002A1
Priority number Date
US2279596 30.07.1996
TypeType Earlier application
 EP0822218