Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992523

EP0992523 - Polyethers manufactured with double metal cyanide catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
General Electric Company
One River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
CROMPTON CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
CK WITCO CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Glenn A.
c/o CK WITKO CORP., One American Lane
Greenwich, CT 06831-2559 / US
02 / Jorgenson, Michael W
1417 Exchange Street
Keokuk, Iowa 56631 / US
03 / Budnik, Richard
77 Carpenter Avenue
Mt. Kisco, New York / US
[2000/22]
Former [2000/15]01 / Miller, Glenn A.
2225 West Washington Street
Charleston, W.Virginia 25312 / US
02 / Jorgenson, Michael W
1417 Exchange Street
Keokuk, Iowa 56631 / US
03 / Budnik, Richard
77 Carpenter Avenue
Mt. Kisco, New York / US
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125514.230.07.1997
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS19960022795P30.07.1996         Original published format: US 22795 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992523
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992523
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G65/10, C08G65/26
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Mit Doppelmetallcyanidkatalysatoren hergestellte Polyether[2003/35]
English:Polyethers manufactured with double metal cyanide catalysts[2000/15]
French:Polyéthers fabriqués en présence de catalyseurs de cyanure de métal double[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]Mit Doppelmetallcyanidkatalysatoren hergestelle Polyether
Examination procedure21.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
03.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2004Fee for grant paid
28.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97113124.8  / EP0822218
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.12.2004   
Bayer MaterialScience AG
Patents and Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/07]
Opponent(s)01  28.12.2004   
Bayer MaterialScience AG
Patents and Licensing
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
07.02.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.08.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/36]
19.04.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.04.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
IT31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
IE30.07.2004
LU30.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT31.08.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2005/46]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
IE30.07.2004
LU30.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
LU30.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/02]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/01]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
SE30.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1584805  (BASF AG) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 97 - line 128; example 3 *;
 [A]US4195167  (HOY KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * example A; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0397036  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 32 - line 41; example 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]US5227434  (KATZ LAWRENCE E [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 23; example A *