Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001045

EP1001045 - Use of a heat-resisting cast steel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/20]Heat-resisting cast steel
[2004/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.2005  [2005/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujita, Akitsugu, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd.
Nagasaki Res.Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome
Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP
02 / Kamada, Masatomo Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd.
Nagasaki Res.Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome
Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote, 1 Stockport Road, Marple
Stockport SK6 6BD / GB
Application number, filing date99125597.710.07.1998
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateJP1997019092516.07.1997         Original published format: JP 19092597
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001045
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001045
Date:06.09.2000
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001045
Date:07.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/18, C22C38/22, C22C38/26, C22C38/30, C22C38/40, C22C38/44
[2000/36]
Former International [2000/20]C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/30, C22C38/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:Verwendung eines Hitzebeständigen Gussstahles[2004/06]
English:Use of a heat-resisting cast steel[2004/06]
French:Utilisation d'un acier coulé thérmoresistant[2004/06]
Former [2000/20]Hitzebeständiger Gussstahl
Former [2000/20]Heat-resisting cast steel
Former [2000/20]Acier coulé thérmoresistant
Examination procedure06.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
16.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2004Fee for grant paid
22.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98305512.0  / EP0892079
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE07.10.2004
[2005/10]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0691416  (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * examples 9,42; table 1 * * page 4, line 30 - line 45 *
ExaminationEP0896071
 EP0887431