Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013964

EP1013964 - Metal V-belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yagasaki, Tooru
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyuusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Kanehara, Shigeru
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyuusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Aoyama, Hideaki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyuusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125612.422.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateJP1998036766124.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36766198
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1013964
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1013964
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1013964
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16G5/16
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2001/13]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Metallischer Keilriemen[2000/26]
English:Metal V-belt[2000/26]
French:Courroie trapézoidale métallique[2000/26]
Examination procedure09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
27.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2003Fee for grant paid
06.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PA]JPH10331920  ;
 [AD]EP0377918  (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]);
 JPH02225840  [ ] (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV);
 [AD]EP0562654  (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]);
 JPH0610993  [ ] (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV)
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 3, [PA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH058359B
 JPH0610993
 JPH02225840