Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020186

EP1020186 - Process for the manufacture of a sustained release tramadol preparation with a storage stable release profile without curing of the coated product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/29]Sustained release tramadol preparations with a storage stable release profile and process for their manufacture
[2004/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grünenthal GmbH
Zieglerstrasse 6
52078 Aachen / DE
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Bartholomäus, Johannes Heinrich, Dr.
In den Atzenbenden 54
52080 Aachen / DE
02 / Ziegler, Iris, Dr.
Im Dickenbruch 6
52159 Rott-Roetgen / DE
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Kutzenberger, Helga , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]Kutzenberger, Helga, Dr. , et al
Kutzenberger & Wolff, Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99125696.723.12.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE1999100168618.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901686
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020186
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020186
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020186
Date:29.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/135, A61K9/52, A61K9/54, A61K9/36, A61K9/50, A61K9/62
[2004/49]
Former International [2000/38]A61K31/135, A61K9/52, A61K9/54, A61K9/36, A61K9/50
Former International [2000/29]A61K31/135, A61K9/52, A61K9/54, A61K9/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
Extension statesLT23.12.1999
LV23.12.1999
SI23.12.1999
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer retardierten Tramadolzubereitung mit einem lagerstabilen Freisetzungsprofil ohne Temperung der gecoateten Zubereitung[2004/49]
English:Process for the manufacture of a sustained release tramadol preparation with a storage stable release profile without curing of the coated product[2004/49]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une préparation de tramadol à effet retard avec un profil de libération stable au stockage sans recuire la préparation[2004/49]
Former [2000/29]Retardierte Tramadolzubereitungen mit einem lagerstabilen Freisetzungsprofil und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung
Former [2000/29]Sustained release tramadol preparations with a storage stable release profile and process for their manufacture
Former [2000/29]Préparations de tramadol à effet retard avec un profil de libération stable au stockage et leur procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/29]
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2004Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2005Fee for grant paid
18.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5645858  (KOTWAL PRAMOD M [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * column 5 - column 8; example 1 *;
 [A]  M. WESSLING ET AL., "Drug release from beads coated with an aqueous colloidal ethylcellulose dispersion, Aquacoat, or an organic ethylcellulose solution", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, Amsterdam (NL), (199901), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 33 - 38, XP000803407 [A] 1-13 * page 34, column 1, line 3 - line 22 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(98)00085-X
 [A]  R.U. NESBITT ET AL., "Effect of substrate on mass release from ethylcellulose latex coated pellets", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, Amsterdam (NL), (199411), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 71 - 77, XP000476667 [A] 1-13 * page 76, column 2, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(94)90226-7