Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1111583 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1111583



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 442
26.01.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
22.12.2008 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
22.12.2008 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.12.2008 French translation of claims Opposition 2
17.10.2008 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
08.10.2008 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
25.02.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
23.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
16.01.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
10.12.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.12.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.12.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.12.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.09.2007 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
20.08.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.08.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.08.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
17.08.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.08.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
09.08.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.06.2007 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
01.06.2007 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 2
19.05.2007 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
25.01.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
25.01.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.09.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
18.09.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.09.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.08.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 29
31.08.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
02.08.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 17
02.08.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 28
02.08.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.08.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
02.08.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 5
04.05.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.04.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.04.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.04.2006 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
20.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
25.03.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 5
12.12.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.11.2005 Annex Opposition 2
29.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.11.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.11.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.11.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.11.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 8
15.11.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 15
15.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
17.10.2005 Request for change of address Opposition 2
06.10.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2004 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
26.08.2004 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
18.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.08.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
16.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.08.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
26.04.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.04.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.03.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.03.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
25.03.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.03.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.03.2004 Request for documents Opposition 1
15.03.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.03.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.03.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
09.05.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.11.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.11.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.11.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
31.10.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
27.09.2002 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
05.09.2002 Description Search / examination 3
05.09.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
01.08.2002 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
24.07.2002 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
19.06.2002 Description Search / examination 3
19.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
10.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
16.05.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.11.2000 Drawings Search / examination 1
15.11.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.06.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
13.06.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.06.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
13.06.2000 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
15.03.2000 Description Search / examination 5
15.03.2000 Drawings Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
11.02.2000 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
24.12.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Authorisation Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
24.12.1999 Description Search / examination 5
24.12.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
23.12.1999 Authorisation Search / examination 1
23.12.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
23.12.1999 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 9