Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020339

EP1020339 - Brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Isono, Hiroshi
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99125766.823.12.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateJP1999000424111.01.1999         Original published format: JP 424199
JP1999012360430.04.1999         Original published format: JP 12360499
JP1999018481630.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18481699
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020339
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020339
Date:02.07.2003
[2003/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020339
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/42, B60T8/44, B60T13/16, B60T13/66
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/13]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bremssystem[2000/29]
English:Brake system[2000/29]
French:Système de freinage[2000/29]
Examination procedure23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/29]
17.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2005Fee for grant paid
22.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19632130  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-23 * abstract;; figures 1,2,7 * * column 4, line 29 - column 4, line 57 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 57 * * column 8, line 29 - line 51 *;
 [A]DE3925649  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract;; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3832722  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract;; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19703776  (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract;; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4838619  (OCVIRK NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4244186  (MEHREN HERBERT) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1 *