blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1016655
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3963607BGlobal Dossier 22.08.2007B2
JP2000264871 26.09.2000A
Priority number Date
JP7060199 16.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3456634BGlobal Dossier 14.10.2003B2
JP2000191634 11.07.2000A
Priority number Date
JP37400898 28.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3444477BGlobal Dossier 08.09.2003B2
JP2000191635 11.07.2000A
Priority number Date
JP37400998 28.12.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1016655Global Dossier 21.05.2003B1
EP1016655 13.06.2001A3
EP1016655 05.07.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP7060199 16.03.1999
JP37400998 28.12.1998
JP37400898 28.12.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69908075T 09.10.2003T2
DE69908075D 26.06.2003D1
Priority number Date
JP7060199 16.03.1999
JP37400998 28.12.1998
JP37400898 28.12.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6156930 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
JP7060199 16.03.1999
JP37400998 28.12.1998
JP37400898 28.12.1998