blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1016655

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
Examination procedure13.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted21.05.2003
Opposition procedure24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 12.05.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.07.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR
 
Event date:05.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:13.06.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:13.06.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:06.03.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR
 
Event date:06.03.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20011207
 
Event date:10.04.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020222
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR
 
Event date:26.06.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69908075
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030626
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:02.04.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:12.05.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040224
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20080229
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090701
 
Event date:21.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20151221
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20170831
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170102