Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016655

EP1016655 - Method for producing trifluoromethanesulfonyl chloride [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED
5253 Oaza Okiube
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Central Glass Company, Limited
5253 Oaza Okiube
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mori, Kaoru
c/o Chemical Research Center, 2805, Imafukunakadai
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1151 / JP
02 / Hamana, Takanori
c/o Chemical Research Center, 2805, Imafukunakadai
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1151 / JP
03 / Sakai, Shigenori
c/o Chemical Research Center, 2805, Imafukunakadai
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1151 / JP
04 / Kawashima, Tadayuki
c/o Chemical Research Center, 2805, Imafukunakadai
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1151 / JP
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/27]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125791.623.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateJP1998037400828.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37400898
JP1998037400928.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37400998
JP1999007060116.03.1999         Original published format: JP 7060199
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016655
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016655
Date:13.06.2001
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016655
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07C303/22, C07C309/80
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2002/10]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Trifluormethansulfonylchlorid[2000/27]
English:Method for producing trifluoromethanesulfonyl chloride[2000/27]
French:Procédé de préparation de chlorure trifluorosulfonyle[2000/27]
Examination procedure07.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/10]
22.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2003Fee for grant paid
13.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2732398  (T. J. BRICE AND P. W. TROTT, MINESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO) [AD] 1-18 * column 3, line 28 - line 30 *;
 [AD]US5338868  (BAN KAROLY [HU], et al) [AD] 1-18 * column 6, line 62 - line 68 *;
 [A]US2403207  (BARRICK PAUL L) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 56 - line 58 * * column 5, line 8 - line 10 *
 [A]  R. N. HASZELDINE, J. M. KIDD, "Perfluoroalkyl Derivatives of Sulfur", J.CHEM.SOC., (1955), pages 2901 - 2908, XP000984089 [A] 1-18 * page 2901, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/jr9550002901