Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992214

EP0992214 - Pulse oximeter and sensor optimized for low saturation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: SE
published on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nellcor Puritan Bennett Incorporated
4280 Hacienda Drive
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Cascani, James R.
7985 Pumpkin Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / Mannheimer, Paul D.
4119 Sugar Maple Drive
Danville, CA 94506 / US
03 / Nierlich, Steve L.
264 Cherrywood Avenue
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
04 / Ruskewicz, Stephen J.
183 Ardmore Road
Kensington, CA 94707 / US
 [2005/02]
Former [2001/44]01 / Cascani, James R.
7985 Pumpkin Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / Mannheimer, Paul D.
4119 Sugar Maple Drive
California 94506 / US
03 / Nierlich, Steve L.
264 Cherrywood Avenue
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
04 / Ruskewicz, Stephen J.
183 Ardmore Road
Kensington, CA 94707 / US
Former [2000/32]01 / Cascani, James R.
7985 Pumpkin Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / Mannheimer, Paul D.
4119 Sugar Maple Drive
California 94506 / US
03 / Nierlich, Steve L.
264 Cherrywood Avenue
San Leandro, CA 94577 / DE
04 / Ruskewicz, Stephen J.
183 Ardmore Road
Kensington, CA 94707 / US
Former [2000/15]01 / Cascani, James R.
7985 Pumpkin Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / Mannheimer, Paul D.
2619 Read Avenue
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
03 / Nierlich, Steve L.
264 Cherrywood Avenue
San Leandro, CA 94577 / DE
04 / Ruskewicz, Stephen J.
183 Ardmore Road
Kensington, CA 94707 / US
Representative(s)Vinsome, Rex Martin
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
12th Floor
Cale Cross House
156 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Vinsome, Rex Martin
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord St Nicholas Chambers Amen Corner
Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 1PE / GB
Application number, filing date99125853.431.03.1995
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS1994022191101.04.1994         Original published format: US 221911
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992214
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992214
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992214
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Für niedrige Sättigung speziell optimierte Pulsoximetermessfühler[2000/15]
English:Pulse oximeter and sensor optimized for low saturation[2000/15]
French:Capteur pour oxymètre destiné à la détection du pouls et optimisé pour les faibles saturations[2000/15]
Examination procedure29.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/27]
15.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2004Fee for grant paid
10.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95915494.9  / EP0754007
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/40]
Former [2007/21]IE31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2006/24]IE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2006/14]MC31.03.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/48]SE12.04.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4623248  (SPERINDE JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 19; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]US4714341  (HAMAGURI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 42 - column 5, line 20; claim 1 *
by applicantUS4830014
 US4770179