blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1018637

EP1018637 - Apparatus and method for detecting change in the resistance of a connector in a sensor circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hill, Bruce L.
2809 Aglen Street
Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/50]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/22]Sturm, Christoph, et al
Honeywell Holding AG, IP Europe Law Dept., Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [2000/28]Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date99125889.824.12.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateUS1999022546206.01.1999         Original published format: US 225462
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018637
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:G01D3/08, G01R31/28
[2000/28]
CPC:
G01D3/08 (EP,US); G01R31/2829 (EP,US); G01R27/205 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Detektierung einer Veränderung des Widerstandes eines Steckverbinders in einer Sensorschaltung[2000/28]
English:Apparatus and method for detecting change in the resistance of a connector in a sensor circuit[2000/28]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour la détection d'un changement de valeur de la résistance d'un connecteur dans le circuit d'un capteur[2003/20]
Former [2000/28]Dispositif et procédé pour la détection d'un changement dans la valeur de résistance d'un connecteur dans un circuit de capteur
Examination procedure26.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
13.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6469962  ;
 [A]US5235527  (OGAWA MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 61; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]JPH03210047
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890629), vol. 013, no. 284, Database accession no. (P - 892), & JP01069962 A 19890315 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911209), vol. 015, no. 485, Database accession no. (M - 1188), & JP03210047 A 19910913 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.