Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1014310

EP1014310 - Certificate meter with selectable indemnification provisions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2013
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.07.2013  [2013/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pitney Bowes Inc.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US
[2012/33]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
PITNEY BOWES INC.
World Headquarter, One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, Connecticut 06926-0700 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weiant, Monroe A., Jr.
249 Putting Green Road
Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US
02 / Ryan, Frederick W., Jr.
4 Naples Lane
Oxford, Connecticut 06478 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2000/26]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125913.623.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateUS1998022082924.12.1998         Original published format: US 220829
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1014310
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1014310
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1014310
Date:15.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/00
[2000/46]
Former International [2000/26]G07B17/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/31]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zertifikatzähler mit wählbarer Tarifierung[2000/26]
English:Certificate meter with selectable indemnification provisions[2000/26]
French:Compteur de certificats avec tarification sélectable[2000/26]
Examination procedure09.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
17.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2012Fee for grant paid
03.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2006
Opposition(s)16.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[A]US4633036  (HELLMAN MARTIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2306865  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figure 5; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5838812  (PARE JR DAVID FERRRIN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5721781  (DEO VINAY [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5796841  (CORDERY ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 2; claim 1 *
by applicantUS5796841
    Pretty Good Privacy (PGP) Bedienungsanleitun, FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH,