Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027848

EP1027848 - Illuminated insertion device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2001
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.12.2001 [2001/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Umdasch-Shop Concept GmbH
Reichsstrasse 23
3300 Amstetten / AT
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Engelke, Roland
Gollingstrasse 57
3381 Golling / AT
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125920.123.12.1999
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateDE199910533309.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19905333
[2000/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1027848
Date:16.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1027848
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47F5/08
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Beleuchtetes Einstecksystem[2000/33]
English:Illuminated insertion device[2000/33]
French:Dispositif d'insertion illuminé[2000/33]
Examination procedure04.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/51]
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3809859  (WERBE-TECHNIK) [X] 11-13,15 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 27 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 1;
 [DA]DE19700596  (HERPA MINIATURMODELLE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19610409  (IDL IND UND LICHT DESIGN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantEP0716825
 EP0834274
 DE19700596