Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1014215

EP1014215 - Developing roller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYNZTEC Co., Ltd.
6-22-7 Minamioi
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2007/46]
Former [2007/27]For all designated states
SYNZTEC CO., LTD
6-22-7 Minamioi
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
NITTO KOGYO CO., LTD.
5-12, Shiba 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirayama, Naka
203, Nagai-Heights, 419-3, Nameri, Nagaizumicho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[2000/26]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99125939.123.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateJP1998036705424.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36705498
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1014215
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1014215
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1014215
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08, C08J9/14
[2001/50]
Former International [2000/26]G03G15/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/36]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Entwicklungsrolle[2000/26]
English:Developing roller[2000/26]
French:Rouleau de développement[2000/26]
Examination procedure23.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
19.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE
24.10.2003Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.11.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2006Fee for grant paid
08.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination27.01.2004Appeal received No.  T0723/04
07.04.2004Statement of grounds filed
02.05.2006Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.07.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.07.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0926571  (NITTO KOGYO KK [JP]) [PX] 1-11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0044] , [0057] - [0063] *;
 [A]JPH08292694  ;
 [A]EP0398125  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 34 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, [A] 1 * abstract *