Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017135

EP1017135 - Press fit SCA connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.
Helftheuvelweg 11
5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / David, James J.
6206 Crosswick Circle
Mechanicsburg, PA 17055 / US
02 / Raistrick, Alan
1061 Grand Oak Way
Rockville, MD 15801 / US
03 / Weigard, Wayne G.
6655 NW 113 Way
Parkland, FL 33067 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99125954.027.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998022414031.12.1998         Original published format: US 224140
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1017135
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1017135
Date:19.02.2003
[2003/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/34
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:SCA Einpressverbinder[2000/27]
English:Press fit SCA connector[2000/27]
French:Connecteur SCA pour insertion à force[2000/27]
Examination procedure01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
16.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200204   M06   Not yet paid
31.12.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5492479  (ORTEGA JOSE L [US]) [X] 1-3,22 * column 5, line 28 - line 46; figures 1-3 * [A] 5-7,21 [Y] 16-20;
 [YA]US5800213  (REGNIER KENT E [US], et al) [Y] 16-20 * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 20; figures 5,17,19 * [A] 1