EP1014251 - Data processor and method of processing data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitao, Ichiro, NEC IC Microcomputer Systems, Ltd. 403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99125964.9 | 27.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | JP19980371106 | 25.12.1998 Original published format: JP 37110698 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014251 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014251 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/24, G06F11/22 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G06F21/56 (EP,US);
G06F1/00 (KR);
G06F1/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Datenprozessor und Datenverarbeitungsverfahren | [2000/26] | English: | Data processor and method of processing data | [2000/26] | French: | Unité de traitement de données et procédé de traitement des données | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH02275513 ; | [XA]JPH11110260 ; | [A]EP0833341 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 4,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 20 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910129), vol. 015, no. 037, Database accession no. (P - 1159), & JP02275513 A 19901109 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,6 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11110260 A 19990423 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,6 |