Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018644

EP1018644 - Variable rate particle counter and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER CORPORATION
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Farrell, Gregory A.
447 Hillcrest Road
Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Burkert, Frank , et al
Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Law and Patents
Patents and Licensing
Building Q 18
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Burkert, Frank , et al
Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99125967.227.12.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateUS1999022593706.01.1999         Original published format: US 225937
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018644
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/14
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zähler für Teilchen variabler Rate und Inwendungsverfahren[2000/28]
English:Variable rate particle counter and method of use[2000/28]
French:Compteur de particules de débit variable et procédé d'utilisation[2000/28]
Examination procedure07.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03