Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989718

EP0989718 - Automated channel test unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[2000/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Abrams, Lane Jordan
28 Locust Street
Falmouth, MA 02540 / US
02 / Loughran, Kevin
69 Everdale Road
Randolph, New Jersey 07869 / US
03 / Masukewicz, David William
P.O. Box 209
Cedar Knolls, New Jersey 07927 / US
04 / Overstreet, Robert Louis, Jr.
27 Ellsworth Avenue
Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US
[2000/28]
Former [2000/13]01 / Abrams, Lane Jordan
12-D Cedar Lane
Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US
02 / Loughran, Kevin
69 Everdale Road
Randolph, New Jersey 07869 / US
03 / Masukewicz, David William
P.O. Box 209
Cedar Knolls, New Jersey 07927 / US
04 / Overstreet, Robert Louis, Jr.
27 Ellsworth Avenue
Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99125976.325.06.1991
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateUS1990054846403.07.1990         Original published format: US 548464
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989718
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989718
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/30
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesGB,   IT [2001/40]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatische Kanaltesteinheit[2000/13]
English:Automated channel test unit[2000/13]
French:Test automatique d'unité de canal[2000/13]
Examination procedure07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
13.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91305727.9  / EP0465089
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[A]US4852145  (BEVERS MOREY S [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 7 - line 14 *;
 [A]WO8602796  (TII COMPUTER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] * abstract *