Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992473

EP0992473 - Gas generant for air bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1, Teppo-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1, Teppo-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamato, Yo
Kinugakeryo, 940, Shinzaike, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Hirata, Norimasa
1-16-96, Ohtsucho, Otsu-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
03 / Takahori, Takeshi
198-1-706, Aza Takazeki, Okidai, Taishicho
Ibo-gung, Hyogo / JP
04 / Yokoyama, Takushi
3-12-2, Kitashinzaike
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
05 / Matsuda, Naoki
500-3-343, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
 [2004/27]
Former [2000/15]01 / Yamato, Yo
Kinugakeryo, 940, Shinzaike, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Hirata, Norimasa
1-16-96, Ohtsucho, Otsu-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
03 / Takahori, Takeshi
198-1-706, Aza Takazeki, Okidai, Taishicho
Ibo-gung, Hyogo / JP
04 / Yokoyama, Takushi
3-12-2, Kitashinzaike
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
05 / Matsuda, Naoki
50O-3-343, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99126027.403.04.1997
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1996019229422.07.1996         Original published format: JP 19229496
JP1996020180231.07.1996         Original published format: JP 20180296
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992473
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992473
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992473
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C06D5/06
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Gasgenerator für einen Airbag[2000/15]
English:Gas generant for air bag[2000/15]
French:Générateur de gaz pour un coussin gonflable[2000/15]
Examination procedure27.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
28.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2004Fee for grant paid
08.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97105556.1  / EP0820971
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.06.2004
ES11.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2005/23]ES11.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5507891  (ZEIGLER EDWARD H [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 3; claim - *;
 [Y]DE19548917  (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, line 20 - line 21; tables 1-5 * * page 3, line 53 - line 65; claim - *;
 [X]EP0661253  (MORTON INT INC [US]) [X] 11,12 * page 3, line 14 - line 23 *;
 [X]DE9416112U  (CONTEC CHEMIEANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 11,12 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 29; claim - *;
 [A]EP0607446  (NIPPON KOKI KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 5; claim - *;
 [A]DE2357303  (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE) [A] 6-9 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]US4386979  (JACKSON JR CHARLES H [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 57 *;
 [Y]EP0673809  (OEA INC [US]) [Y] 6-9 * page 12, line 14 - line 40; examples 1-5; claim - *;
 [A]EP0619284  (TRW INC [US]) [A] 6-9 * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 11 *