Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016540

EP1016540 - Method and apparatus for forming image with coating of recording liquid and undercoating liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matumoto, Nobuo, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Ryoichi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Ishizaka, Hideo, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date99126098.528.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateJP1998037466228.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37466298
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016540
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016540
Date:30.01.2002
[2002/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016540
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/21, B41M3/00, B05C5/00, B05C5/02
[2002/05]
Former International [2000/27]B41M3/00, B05C5/00, B05C5/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/42]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Bilderzeugung mit Beschichtung von Aufzeichnungsflüssigkeit und Grundbeschichtungsflüssikeit[2000/27]
English:Method and apparatus for forming image with coating of recording liquid and undercoating liquid[2000/27]
French:Procédé et dispositif de formation d'image à revêtement par liquide d'enregistrement et liquide de couche de fond[2000/27]
Examination procedure09.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/24]
31.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.12.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
18.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2005Fee for grant paid
02.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.09.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5646656  (LEONHARDT HOLGER [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 60 *;
 [A]EP0870615  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * column 10, line 21 - line 44; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0739742  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *;
 [DA]JPS63291663  ;
 [DA]US4109282  (ROBERTSON PENROSE DAVID, et al) [DA] 1,13 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 18; figure - *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890323), vol. 013, no. 119, Database accession no. (C - 579), [DA] 1,13 * abstract *
by applicantUS3416153
 US3946398
 US4490728
 US4109282
 JPS63291663