Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020428

EP1020428 - Process for recrystallizing 1,3-bis(aminophenoxy benzene) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington
Delaware 19803-7663 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663
Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Scotchie, Lawrence J.
9908 Wolf Creek Trail
Charlotte, North Carolina 28269 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Held, Stephan , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date99126135.529.12.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateUS1999023103914.01.1999         Original published format: US 231039
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020428
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C217/90, C07C213/10
[2000/29]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/14]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Prozess zur Umkristalliation von 1,3-bis(aminophenoxy benzene)[2000/29]
English:Process for recrystallizing 1,3-bis(aminophenoxy benzene)[2000/29]
French:Procéder pour la recristalliation de 1,3-bis(aminophenoxy benzene)[2000/29]
Examination procedure20.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
31.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.02.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6351363  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880727), vol. 012, no. 270, Database accession no. (C - 515), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - MASAO TOMITA, MUNEAKI TAKASE, "Syntheses of thiazole derivatives containing diphenyl ether nucleus", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19560410), vol. 50, no. 7, Database accession no. 5618, XP002135639 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - M. TOMITA ET AL., "Syntheses of thiazole derivatives containing diphenyl ether nucleus", J. PHARM. SOC. JAPAN, (1955), vol. 75, pages 1077 - 1081,