Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016642

EP1016642 - Process for pentane disproportionation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phillips Petroleum Company
5th and Keeler Bartlesville
Oklahoma 74004 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY
5th and Keeler
Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Johnson, Marvin M.
4413 SE Woodland Road
Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US
02 / Randolph, Bruce B.
233 Turkey Creek Rd
Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2000/27]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99126138.929.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998022422830.12.1998         Original published format: US 224228
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016642
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C6/10
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Disproportionieren von Pentan[2000/27]
English:Process for pentane disproportionation[2000/27]
French:Procédé de dismutation de pentane[2000/27]
Examination procedure10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
28.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/04]
14.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2461541  (FREY FREDERICK E) [A] 1 * claim 5 *;
 [A]US5489727  (RANDOLPH BRUCE B [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US4025577  (SISKIN MICHAEL, et al) [A] 1 * example 2; claim - *