Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050705

EP1050705 - Hose clip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2009  [2009/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Togo Seisakusyo Corporation
1, Hiruike-aza, Haruki-oaza, Togo-cho Aichi-gun
Aichi 470-0162 / JP
[2008/22]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Togo Seisakusyo Corporation
1, Hiruike-aza, Haruki-oaza, Togo-cho
Aichi-gun, Aichi 470-0162 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Muto, Mineo, c/o Togo Seisakusyo Corporation
1, Hiruike-aza, Haruki-oaza, Togo-cho
Aichi-gun, Aichi / JP
02 / Nakamura, Yuji, c/o Togo Seisakusyo Corporation
1, Hiruike-aza, Haruki-oaza, Togo-cho
Aichi-gun, Aichi / JP
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99126145.429.12.1999
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateJP1999012761107.05.1999         Original published format: JP 12761199
JP1999030859729.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30859799
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050705
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050705
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16L33/02
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/30]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rohrschelle[2000/45]
English:Hose clip[2000/45]
French:Collier de serrage[2000/45]
Examination procedure25.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
02.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2008Fee for grant paid
10.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4930192  (MUHR RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 35 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, lines 8-37 * [Y] 3-5,8,13;
 [PY]US6038744  (ZIELINSKI MICHAEL [US]) [PY] 3,4,13 * abstract * * column 4, lines 39-54 * * column 6, lines 40-51 *;
 [Y]DE4305649  (MUHR & BENDER [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *;
 [YA]US5664295  (KUME MASATO [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * column 6, lines 35-41 * [A] 7;
 [A]US5185907  (KAWASHIMA MAKINORI [JP], et al) [A] 9-12,14-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, lines 3-16,47-59 *;
 [A]JPH08178155
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [A] 6,7 * abstract * * figures 1,5 *