Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020600

EP1020600 - Door leaf guide and associated door wing system, in particular for automatic sliding doors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
agta record ag
Allmendstrasse 24
8320 Fehraltorf / CH
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Bunzl, Helmut Heinz
Waldegg 4
8126 Zumikon / CH
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul , et al
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Andrae Flach Haug Prinzregentenstrasse 24
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Application number, filing date99126227.030.12.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE199910118814.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901188
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020600
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020600
Date:14.08.2002
[2002/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:E05D15/06
[2000/29]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/19]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Türblattführung sowie zugehörige Türflügelanordnung, insbesondere für automatische Schiebetüren[2000/29]
English:Door leaf guide and associated door wing system, in particular for automatic sliding doors[2000/29]
French:Glissière de guidage d'un battant de porte et dispositif de vantail de porte associé, en particulier pour portes coulissantes automatiques[2000/29]
Examination procedure15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
20.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.03.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.03.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.03.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9111169U  (DORMA GMBH & CO) [X] 1,2,4-6,15,19 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 9 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US5103589  (CRAWFORD RALPH E) [X] 1,2,4,6,15,19 * column 5, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]DE19753219  (ACROTECH AG [LI]) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 20 - line 66 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]DE2614809  (HEINZE FA R, et al) [X] 1,12 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *
by applicantDE4400940