Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0922443

EP0922443 - Compression pad for use with a brassiere of flexible material to increase tissue pressure to consolidate the effect of manual lymphatic drainage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Barbé-Vicuna, Albina Maria Lucrecia
Willem II Straat 68
5038 BJ Tilburg / NL
[1999/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Barbe-Vicuna, Albina Maria Lucrecia
Willem II Straat 68
5038 BJ Tilburg / NL
[1999/32]
Former [1999/24]01 / x
x
x / ES
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [1999/24]de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99200022.418.08.1994
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateNL1993000143218.08.1993         Original published format: NL 9301432
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0922443
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0922443
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/14, A41C3/14, A61F2/52
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:Druckkissen für einem aus flexiblem Material bestehenden Büstenhalter zur Verstärkung des Effekts manueller Lymphdrainagebehandlung durch Erhöhung des Drucks auf das Gewebe[2002/02]
English:Compression pad for use with a brassiere of flexible material to increase tissue pressure to consolidate the effect of manual lymphatic drainage[1999/24]
French:Soutien-gorge a compression avec coussin ayant un effect augmantant de drainage lymphatique Coussin de compression pour un soutien-gorge en matériau flexible augmentant la pression exercée sur les tissus afin de perpétuer l'effet d'un drainage lymphatique manuel[2002/02]
Former [1999/24]Komprimierender Büstenhalter mit Kissen für manuelle Lymphatische Drawage
Former [1999/24]Soutien-gorge a compression avec coussin ayant un effect de drawage lymphatique manuel
Examination procedure15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
28.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2002Fee for grant paid
12.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94927866.7  / EP0740511
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2121291  (HALL OLGA AUDRIE) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 10;
 [XY]US4071914  (SILVERMAN ABE) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 25 * * column 4, line 45 - line 61 * * column 5, line 30 - line 39 * * column 6, line 39 - line 50 * * figures 1,2,4,6,23,24 * [Y] 10;
 [Y]GB1502347  (THAMERT O GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 70 - line 97 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0005275  (BAUERFEIND HANS B) [A] 1 * page 4, line 14 - line 35 * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3196464  (MCKEE FLORENCE C) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3878568  (CONNELLY WILLIAM N)