blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1018417

EP1018417 - Coated mould for making polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2001
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.11.2001 [2001/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Bastin, Benoit Etienne Jean-Marie Ghislain
Avenue Jean Monnet 1
1348 Ottignies, Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
02 / Clerinx, Johannes Eduard Irene Marie Jozefa
Avenue Jean Monnet 1
1348 Ottignies, Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
[2000/28]
Application number, filing date99200030.707.01.1999
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018417
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:B29C33/40, B29C33/56, // B29C33/00, B29C33/62, B29C44/58, B29C44/46
[2000/28]
CPC:
B29C44/58 (EP); B29C33/40 (EP); B29C33/56 (EP);
B29C33/68 (EP); B29C33/62 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/12]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beschichtete Form für die Herstellung von Polyurethanschaum[2000/28]
English:Coated mould for making polyurethane foams[2000/28]
French:Moule avec revêtement pour la production de mousse de polyuréthane[2000/28]
Examination procedure13.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/48]
18.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.02.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.02.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4207279  (BOON DERK J) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 35 - line 43 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 2; figure 6 *;
 [X]GB1414465  (LADNEY M) [X] 1,9,11,12 * page 1, line 64 - line 70 * * page 2, line 94 - line 105; figure 6 * * page 3, line 86 - line 100 *;
 [X]GB980754  (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1,9,11,12 * page 2, line 5 - line 29 *;
 [A]GB922059  (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.) [A] 1,9,11,12 * page 2, line 126 - page 3, line 5 *;
 [A]GB1003034  (DUNLOP RUBBER CO. LTD.) [A] 1,9,11,12 * page 1, line 44 - line 79 *;
 [A]DE1203448  (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG.) [A] 1,9,11,12 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 16; figure . *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.