Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0955743

EP0955743 - Data communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/32]
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishii, Teruyuki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/45]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/45]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99200251.927.03.1992
[1999/45]
Priority number, dateJP1991006582929.03.1991         Original published format: JP 6582991
[1999/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0955743
Date:10.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0955743
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0955743
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L1/16, H04N1/32
[1999/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/45]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung für Datenkommunikation[1999/45]
English:Data communication apparatus[1999/45]
French:Dispositif pour la communication de données[1999/45]
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
16.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2006Fee for grant paid
02.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92302754.4  / EP0508659
Opposition(s)10.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29]
Request for further processing for:27.06.2006Request for further processing filed
27.06.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.07.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 13
18.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 14
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.08.2006
IT09.08.2006
DE10.11.2006
ES20.11.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/17]IT09.08.2006
DE10.11.2006
ES20.11.2006
Former [2007/21]ES20.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4975783  (TAKAOKA TATSUO [JP]) [X] 1,4,7 [A] 3,6,9;
 [XA]DE3927180  (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,7 [A] 3,6,9