blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1023977

EP1023977 - Process for preparing cellulosic fibrous aggregates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plato International Technology B.V.
Westervoortsedijk 73
6827 AV Arnhem / NL
[2003/16]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Plato Beheer B.V.
1B, Wildekamp
6704 AT Wageningen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Groeneveld, Hendrik Adriaan Cornelis
Thermatenweg 1a
3455 SM Haarzuilens / NL
02 / Belle, Jeroen Frederik Arthur
Vingerhoed 79
6953 BZ Dieren / NL
03 / Maasen, Wilhelmus Antonius Hendrikus
Leeuwerikstraat 21
6921 KL Duiven / NL
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Volmer, Johannes Cornelis, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/16]Volmer, Johannes Cornelis, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2000/31]Volmer, Johannes Cornelis
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date99200258.428.01.1999
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1023977
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1023977
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:B27N1/00, C02F3/28
[2000/31]
CPC:
B27N1/00 (EP); C02F2103/28 (EP); C02F3/286 (EP);
C02F3/30 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zellulosefaseraggregaten[2000/31]
English:Process for preparing cellulosic fibrous aggregates[2000/31]
French:Procédé de préparation des aggrégats de fibres cellulosiques[2000/31]
Examination procedure22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
15.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2005Fee for grant paid
12.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
CY28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
FR28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
GB28.01.2006
IE30.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/52]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
FR28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
GB28.01.2006
IE30.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2008/40]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
GB28.01.2006
IE30.01.2006
FR31.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2008/17]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
GB28.01.2006
IE30.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2007/21]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
GB28.01.2006
IE30.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/44]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
DK28.12.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/33]BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/15]FI28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI28.09.2005
SE28.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0133846  (SCA DEVELOPMENT AB) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [DY]EP0852174  (PLATO BEHEER BV) [DY] 1-14 * page 2, column 2, line 46 - page 3, column 3, line 1 * * page 3, column 3, line 23 - line 32 * * page 3, column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 18 * * page 4, column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 20; claim - *;
 [A]US4461708  (HAKULINEN RISTO ET AL);
 [A]US4022665  (GHOSH SAMBHUNATH ET AL);
 [A]US5670047  (BURKE DENNIS A);
 [DA]EP0373726  (SHELL INT RESEARCH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.