blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0934745

EP0934745 - Use of androsterone derivatives for inhibiting DNA binding of ap-1 and airway smooth muscle proliferation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL doing business as Carolinas Medical Center
P.O. Box 32861
Charlotte, NC 28232-2861 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL doing business as Carolinas Medical Center
P.O. Box 32861
Charlotte, NC 28232-2861 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kennedy, Thomas Preston
213 Grande Drive
Richmond, Virginia 23229 / US
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Lane, Cathal Michael, et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Lane, Cathal Michael, et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2001/01]Lane, Cathal Michael, et al
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [1999/32]Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al
Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date99200310.303.02.1999
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateUS1998001878204.02.1998         Original published format: US 18782
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934745
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934745
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/565, A61P11/06
[2003/38]
CPC:
A61K31/5685 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP)
Former IPC [1999/32]A61K31/565
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
TitleGerman:Androsteron-Derivate, deren Verwendung zur Unterdrückung der Bindung des Aktivatorproteins AP-1 an die DNA wie der Vermehrung der glatten Muskelzellen der Atemwege[1999/32]
English:Use of androsterone derivatives for inhibiting DNA binding of ap-1 and airway smooth muscle proliferation[1999/32]
French:Dérivés de l'androstérone et leur utilisation pour l'inhibition de la fixation de la protéine activatrice AP-1 à l'ADN et de la prolifération des cellules des muscles lisses des voies respiratoires[1999/32]
Examination procedure03.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
03.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
02.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2004Fee for grant paid
06.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
[2005/18]
Former [2005/02]FI28.04.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE28.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0143764  (DRACO AB [SE]) [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract and page 2, first para.*;
 [Y]US4529548  (VARMA RAVI K [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract, col. 3, lines 20-60*;
 [Y]WO9420111  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract, page 1, lines 19-39, page 2, lines 31 bridging with page 3, lines 1-8, page 133, lines 10-31, page 29, table 1*;
 [Y]  - C.B MAHOOD, ET AL., "Dehydroepiandrosterone sulphate concentrations in asthmatic patients: pilot study", THE NEW ZEALAND MEDICAL JOURNAL, (19841128), vol. 97, no. 768, pages 805 - 808, XP002103037 [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract, introduction and discussion on page 808, left col., 3rd para.*
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.