Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963852

EP0963852 - A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/08]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Desie, Guido
c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IEE 3800, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
02 / Van den Wijngaert, Hilbrand
c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IEE 3800, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
03 / Backeljauw, François
c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IEE 3800, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[1999/50]
Application number, filing date99200479.618.02.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateEP1998020196509.06.1998         Original published format: EP 98201965
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0963852
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963852
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/415
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/34]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckverfahren und Steuerung für Druckkopf mit Ablenkelektroden zum direkten elektrostatischen Drucken[1999/50]
English:A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes.[1999/50]
French:Méthode d'impression et contrôle pour une tête d'impression avec électrodes de déviation pour l'impression électrostatique directe[1999/50]
Examination procedure23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
23.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
23.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2001Fee for grant paid
08.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.05.2001
NL16.05.2001
[2003/09]
Former [2002/12]BE16.05.2001
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19739988  (ARRAY PRINTERS AB [SE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9735725  (ARRAY PRINTERS AB [SE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0945275
by applicantUS3689935
 US4860036
 US5666148
 US5714992
 US5659344
 EP0780740
 US5625392
 DE19534705