blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0950585


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
16.09.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
10.04.2002 Renewal fee
05.04.2002 First examination report
28.03.2002 Examination report or reply
02.04.2001 Renewal fee
29.01.2001 Loss of particular rights
25.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
19.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
19.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.2000 [2000/27]
11.12.1999 Publication of search report published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
03.09.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.10.1999 [1999/42]