blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0950585

Designated contracting statesAT 
DE 
ES 
FR 
GB 
IT 
SE 
Examination procedure19.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.10.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT DE ES FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:20.10.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000511
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT DE ES FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:22.05.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020404
 
Event date:26.02.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20020815