Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0950585

EP0950585 - Vehicle anti-theft device with vocal signaller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maffioli, Giampaolo
Via Negroponte, 9
30100 Venezia / IT
For all designated states
Omenigrandi, Marco
Via Stivo, 56
38068 Rovereto (TN) / IT
[1999/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Omenigrandi, Marco
Via Stivo, 56
38068 Rovereto (TN) / IT
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Mittler, Enrico , et al
Mittler & C. S.r.l.
Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Mittler, Enrico , et al
c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99200571.001.03.1999
[1999/42]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0080817.04.1998         Original published format: IT MI980808
[1999/42]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0950585
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0950585
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/10
[1999/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/40]
Former [1999/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugdiebstahlsicherung mit Sprachausgabevorrichutng[1999/42]
English:Vehicle anti-theft device with vocal signaller[1999/42]
French:Dispositif antivol pour véhicule avec réponse audio[1999/42]
Examination procedure11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
04.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/09]
19.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9426567  (WATSON ELEMENTARE SRL ;COLIZZA MICHELE (IT)) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13-15,17 * page 6, line 1 - line 31 * * page 7, line 2 - line 8 * * page 8, line 7 - line 10 * * page 9, line 12 - line 14 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 5 * * page 14, line 26 - page 15, line 11 * * page 16, line 4 - line 17 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 12,16;
 [X]US5515043  (NIXON DAVID C ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,6,10,17 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, line 18 - line 23 * * figures 2,3,5 *;
 [Y]EP0242099  (ADVANCED STRATEGICS INC) [Y] 16 * page 2, line 35 - line 47 * * page 3, line 34 - line 53 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE3730672  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 12 * abstract *